MA H3039 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the seal and motto of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolve providing for the creation of a special commission relative to the seal and motto of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Byron Rushing [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Thomas Kennedy [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] |
Rep. Gloria Fox [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4519 |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Weymouth Town Hall |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4519 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3039 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12015&generalCourtId=1 |