MA H3044 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of veteran regarding eligibility for distinctive registration plates. Transportation.
Title
To expand veteran license plate eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3236 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3236 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3044 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3044.pdf |