MA H3046 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the placing of memorial markers on public roadways to commemorate victims of fatal car crashes or vehicular homicides. Transportation.
Title
To establish public memorials
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3046 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3046.pdf |