MA H3068 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4675
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to procure public products or services from businesses in Massachusetts or the United States. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To procure public products or services from Massachusetts or the United States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4675 |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H326 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H846 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S535
H847 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S535 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
H846 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S535
H847 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S535 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3068.pdf |