MA H308 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4297
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the inspection of certain piping during home inspections and home energy audits. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the proper bonding and grounding of CSST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4297 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H278 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4297 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4297 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H308.pdf |