MA H3088 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to identifying, preserving and commemorating historic roadways in the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
Establishing a special commission to identify, preserve and commemorate historic roadways in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2112 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2016
S2319 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2089 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1714 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S689 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1147 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2147
S1702 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2319 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2089 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1714 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S689 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1147 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2147
S1702 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3088 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3088.pdf |