MA H3092 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the collection of data regarding the use of solitary confinement in prisons, jails and houses of correction. The Judiciary.
Title
To collect data regarding the use of solitary confinement in Massachusetts prisons and jails
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1286 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2248 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2338 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1290 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S1286 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2248 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2338 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1290 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3092 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3092.pdf |