MA H3093 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clarifying violations that occur while driving with a hardship license. Transportation.
Title
To clarify penalties for violations occurring while driving with a hardship license
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3093 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3093.pdf |