MA H3097 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to speed limits in historic districts. Transportation.
Title
Relative to speed limits in historic districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3097 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3097.pdf |