MA H3113 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the registration of certain web sites by political parties and committees and candidates for public office. Election Laws.
Title
Prohibiting certain election practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2011 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3113 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13985&generalCourtId=1 |