MA H3116 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating the classes and penalties of controlled substances . The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to enhancing public safety in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1076 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S972 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2501 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
H1076 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S972 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2501 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3116.pdf |