MA H3118 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4910
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of state funds to purchase bottled water. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To promote cost savings through the use of public water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4910 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2109 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2631
S1538 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4910 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1538 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4910 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3118 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3118.pdf |