MA H3120 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3315
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the law relative to the use of leghold traps for capturing furbearing animals. [committee].
Title
Relative to beavers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3315 |
2011-03-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2011 from 11:00 AM-12:50 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3315 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3120 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14900&generalCourtId=1 |