MA H3130 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of veterans’ agents. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the appointment of veterans' agents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:30 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1685 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4105
H316 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2713 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H74 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4105
H316 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2713 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H74 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3130.pdf |