MA H3139 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4230
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Hill of Ipswich, a petition of Bradford R. Hill and others that the Department of Housing and Community Development be directed to allow preference to veterans from other communities over local residents. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to veterans preference for public housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4230 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 13, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:30 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4230 (Replaced by) 2016-05-11 - New draft substituted, see H4278
H3140 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H201 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2755 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2753 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1376 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3140 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H201 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2755 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2753 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1376 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3139 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3139.pdf |