MA H3156 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improving government accountability. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Improving government accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-12-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2096 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2095 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2020 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2095 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2020 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3156 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3156.pdf |