MA H3170 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to designating a certain bridge in the town of Falmouth as the Deputy John Robert Kotfila Jr. memorial bridge. Transportation.
Title
Relative to designating a certain bridge in the town of Falmouth as the Deputy John Robert Kotfila Jr. memorial bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2020 |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-03-30 | House | Enacted |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-03-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-08-08 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
H3191 (Similar To) 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2020
H3067 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2019
S2132 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2020
H3743 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
S2244 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - New draft substituted (Rush), see S2272
S2272 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2019
H3191 (Similar To) 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2020
H3067 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2019
S2132 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2020
H3743 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
S2244 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - New draft substituted (Rush), see S2272
S2272 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3170 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3170.pdf |