MA H3185 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Joseph Esposito, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Joseph Esposito, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-05-04 | House | Enacted |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-05-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-03-30 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-03-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-03-30 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3185 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3185.pdf |