MA H3186 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to adjusting the recreational marijuana tax structure. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Relative to the marijuana tax rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
S1525 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1640 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1647 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1650 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1581 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H1613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2090 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3776
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
S2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - see H2623
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
S1525 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1640 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1647 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1650 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1581 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H1613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2090 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3776
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
S2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - see H2623
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3186.pdf |