MA H3195 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for a tax deduction of health insurance payments from gross income for self employed individuals. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the deduction of health insurance payments from gross income for self employed individuals
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2011 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-21 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3195 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14836&generalCourtId=1 |