MA H3202 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the veteran status of certain reservists. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the veteran status of certain reservists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S416 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S2632
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S416 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S2632
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3202.pdf |