MA H3211 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the Department of Transitional Assistance from issuing certain work requirement waivers under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to SNAP work requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4613 |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1520 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H591 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1755 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1754 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H108 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1520 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H591 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1755 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1754 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H108 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3211 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3211.pdf |