MA H3214 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to returning the payment of bonuses to veterans of the Persian Gulf War to the Office of the Treasurer and Receiver General from the Department of Veterans Services. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Returning the payment of bonuses to soldiers during the Persian Gulf War to the Treasurer's office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3214 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3214.pdf |