MA H3221 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the membership of the board of agriculture within the Department of Agricultural Resources. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To strengthen and expand the board of agriculture
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-03-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3221 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14921&generalCourtId=1 |