MA H3225 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3587
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-25 - Accompanied H3587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-25 - Accompanied H3587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act increasing the number of licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages in the city of Quincy By Representative Mariano of Quincy and Senator Keenan, a joint petition of Ronald Mariano and others (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Quincy be authorized to issues additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages and wine and malt beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Increasing the number of licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages in the city of Quincy
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Mariano [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
Rep. Martin Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Accompanied H3587 |
2013-07-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3587 |
2013-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 03:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3587 (Replaced by) 2013-10-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2013
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3225 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3225.pdf |