MA H3227 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require students to provide reasons for choosing to attend a school outside of his or her resident district. Education.
Title
Regarding school choice
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4139 |
2015-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4139 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3227.pdf |