MA H328 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4010
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to limited liability corporations dealing with children By Mr. Arciero of Westford, a petition of James Arciero and others that limited liability corporations dealing with children be licensed through the Department of Early Education . Education.
Title
Relative to limited liability corporations dealing with children
Sponsors
Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] |
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4010 |
2013-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4010 (Replaced by) 2014-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H328 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H328.pdf |