MA H3284 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the transportation system in the Commonwealth to encourage economic stability and growth through job retention and development. Transportation.
Title
Relative to transportation investment, regional fairness, and accountability to state policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4443 |
2013-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2013 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4443 (Replaced by) 2014-09-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3284 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3284.pdf |