MA H3297 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1831
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Accompanied H1831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Accompanied H1831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a charter for the governance of Plymouth County. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Establishing the Plymouth County government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Accompanied H1831 |
2013-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1831 (Replaced by) 2014-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3297 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3297.pdf |