MA H3300 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage local service delivery of Registry of Motor Vehicle services. Transportation.
Title
To improve the functioning and fairness of Registry of Motor Vehicles services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4716 |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S941 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4833
S2224 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2632
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2429 (Similar To) 2023-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4716 (Replaced by) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2224 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2632
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2429 (Similar To) 2023-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4716 (Replaced by) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3300.pdf |