MA H3304 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Springfield to reinstate and pay certain retirement benefits to Derek Cook, a former member of the retirement system of the city of Springfield. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the retirement allowance of Derek Cook in the city of Springfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3304 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3304.pdf |