MA H3313 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to customer access to a modern electric grid. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to modern grid access and customer service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4348 |
2021-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3313 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3313.pdf |