MA H3314 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to eliminate the biennial vehicle registration renewal fee for persons issued a distinctive plate for veterans. Transportation.
Title
Relative to fees for veterans plates
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3314 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3314.pdf |