MA H3326 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to corporate excise taxes for homeowners associations organized as corporations. Revenue.
Title
Relative to corporate excise taxes for homeowners associations organized as corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1539 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1117 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S496 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1568 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied H3337
H1541 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H3016 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H699 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H702 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H698 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H147 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H560 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1117 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S496 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1568 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied H3337
H1541 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H3016 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H699 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H702 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H698 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H147 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H560 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3326.pdf |