MA H3326 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to redefining the term natural gas compressor station. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Redefining natural gas compressor station
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S519 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S605
H3363 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3279 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3363 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3279 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3326.pdf |