MA H3327 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3763
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-14 - Reported, in part, by H3763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-14 - Reported, in part, by H3763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act financing improvements to the Commonwealth’s transportation system
Title
Financing improvements to the Commonwealth’s transportation system
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-14 | House | Reported, in part, by H3763 |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported, in part, by H3379 |
2013-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/25/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3763 (Replaced by) 2014-01-21 - New draft substituted, see H3860
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3327 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3327.pdf |