MA H3331 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the charitable purposes of certain organizations. The Judiciary.
Title
To clarify the charitable purposes of certain organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2118 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H389 (Similar To) 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S841 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2090 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2118 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H389 (Similar To) 2020-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S841 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2090 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3331 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3331.pdf |