MA H3335 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to renewable energy generation and market efficiency. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to renewable energy generation and market efficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2157 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3311 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3311 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3335 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3335.pdf |