MA H3350 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Housing and Community Development to implement rules and regulations requiring minimum percentages of affordable units in comprehensive building permits. Housing.
Title
Relative to affordable housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4136 |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4136 (Replaced by) 2014-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3350 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3350.pdf |