MA H3350 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3856
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the value agricultural and horticultural land for tax purposes. Revenue.
Title
Relative to expanding agricultural land
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3856 |
2017-04-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1668 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1572 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H444 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3744
S1532 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H1636 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4066
H2561 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3856 (Replaced by) 2017-08-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2113 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4041
S1572 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H444 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3744
S1532 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H1636 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4066
H2561 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3856 (Replaced by) 2017-08-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2113 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4041
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3350 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3350.pdf |