MA H3352 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3183
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - See H3183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - See H3183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with recommendation of amendments the engrossed Bill relative to establishing a sick leave bank for Daniel Cardillo, an employee of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance(see House, No. 3183).
Title
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with recommendation of amendments the engrossed Bill relative to establishing a sick leave bank for Daniel Cardillo, an employee of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance(see House, No. 3183).
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | See H3183 |
Same As/Similar To
H3183 (Replaced by) 2015-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3352 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3352.pdf |