MA H3362 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Collins of Boston, a petition of Nick Collins and others that ten percent of individuals hired within a state contract be individuals with disabilities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to employment of persons with disabilities on state contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Collins [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] |
Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H708 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H98 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H93 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4168 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H98 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H93 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4168 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3362 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3362.pdf |