MA H3369 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the participation of communities served by municipal light plants in the green communities program. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Removing barriers for municipal power communities to become green communities
Sponsors
Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2171 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3327 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
H3257 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4307 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4351 (Similar To) 2022-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 230 of the Acts of 2022
S2716 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3327 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
H3257 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4307 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4351 (Similar To) 2022-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 230 of the Acts of 2022
S2716 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3369 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3369.pdf |