MA H3372 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the performance of abortions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to pregnancy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3434 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1209 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1015 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S587 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3434 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1209 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1015 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S587 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3372 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3372.pdf |