MA H3379 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to financing improvements to the Commonwealth's transportation system (House, No. 3327), reports, in part, recommending that the accompanying bill (House, No. 3379) ought to pass. April 1, 2013.
Title
Financing improvements to the commonwealth's transportation system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #57 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2013-05-15 | House | Enacted 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 116) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-05-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed to be engrossed 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 111) |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment 15 adopted, as changed |
2013-04-24 | House | Read third |
2013-04-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-04-03 | House | Order adopted, see H3381 |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported on a part of H3327 |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3379 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3379.pdf |