MA H3384 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1196
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S1196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S1196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require training on the diagnosis, treatment and care of patients with cognitive impairments for the renewal of a physician’s certificate. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Requiring physician training on Alzheimer's and dementia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Accompanied S1196 |
2015-10-19 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1196 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3384 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3384.pdf |