MA H3388 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4060
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to to allow non-profits and charities to purchase alcohol from retail package stores for use at charitable events. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To allow non-profits to purchase alcohol from retail package stores for charitable events
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. Cleon Turner [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4060 |
2014-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4060 (Replaced by) 2014-05-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3388 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3388.pdf |