MA H3396 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5075
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the feasibility of establishing a time limit for handicapped parking placard use in metered spots. Transportation.
Title
Resolve to establish a special commission to perform an investigation and providing for a study relative to the potential implementation of a time limit for handicapped parking placard use in a metered spot
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5075 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3700 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5075 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3688 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S259 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2728
S2081 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3700 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5075 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3688 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S259 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2728
S2081 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3396.pdf |