MA H341 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4070
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4070
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid payments to critical access hospitals. Health Care Financing.
Title
Creating a rate methodology for critical access hospitals
Sponsors
Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Sen. Benjamin Downing [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] |
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4070 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4070 (Replaced by) 2012-12-31 - Reported, in part, by H4561
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H341 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10406&generalCourtId=1 |