MA H3419 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4657
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize a farmers market healthy alternative incentive program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Encouraging SNAP purchases at local community farmers markets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4657 |
2015-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Westport Grange |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4657 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3419.pdf |